RI H6172 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-27 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Defines secondary agricultural operations and would provide that municipalities may limit and regulate secondary agricultural use if it is determined that the use is harmful to public safety, but may not prohibit such agricultural operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Right To Farm

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 45 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27HouseHouse passed Sub A
2017-06-27HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/27/2017)
2017-06-27HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-06-27HouseScheduled for consideration (06/27/2017)
2017-05-10HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-05-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2017)
2017-04-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback