RI H6154 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires any facility or business which teaches, gives lessons, classes or training to children and youth to have their prospective employees submit to a criminal background check, through the state or local police department, prior to them being hired.
Title
Department Of Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2021) |
2021-03-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6154.pdf |