RI H6117 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Amending The Membership Of The Special Legislative Commission On Defense Economy Planning (amends The Membership Of The Special Legislative Commission On Defense Economy Planning By Increasing The Number Of Members From Twenty-five (25) To Twenty-six (26) By Adding The Director Of Veteran's Affairs, Or Designee.)
Title
Joint Resolution Amending The Membership Of The Special Legislative Commission On Defense Economy Planning (amends The Membership Of The Special Legislative Commission On Defense Economy Planning By Increasing The Number Of Members From Twenty-five (25) To Twenty-six (26) By Adding The Director Of Veteran's Affairs, Or Designee.)
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Robert Lancia [R] | Rep. Joy Hearn [D] |
Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2017-06-15 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2017) |
2017-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-06-02 | House | Committee transferred to House Veterans Affairs |
2017-04-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |