RI H6111 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act In Amendment Of An Act Entitled "an Act To Incorporate The Harmony Fire District" Passed At The January Session Of The General Assembly, A.d. 1945, As Amended: would make several technical changes to the Act to Incorporate the Harmony Fire District.
Title
An Act In Amendment Of An Act Entitled "an Act To Incorporate The Harmony Fire District" Passed At The January Session Of The General Assembly, A.d. 1945, As Amended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-14 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2011-06-09 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-07 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-31 | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government | |
2011-05-26 | House read and passed | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-04 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H6111.pdf |