RI H6090 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Pawtucket to exempt from taxation the real and personal property of the Neil J. Houston, Jr. Community Resources for Justice Center.
Title
City Of Pawtucket -- Neil J. Houston, Jr. Residential Re-entry Center
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. David Coughlin [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-10-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (09/14/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Committee heard |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2017) |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/26/2017) |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/12/2017) |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |