RI H6088 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Benefits for students with disabilities continue until the end of the public school calendar semester when the student turns 21 or when the student’s program ends in accordance with the student’s (IEP), whichever occurs earlier.
Title
Children With Disabilities
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2017-05-25 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2017) |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2017) |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor |
2017-05-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/10/2017) |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2017) |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |