RI H6083 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends several sections of law relating to low-and moderate-income housing and the application, appeal, and judicial review process.
Title
Low And Moderate Income Housing
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] |
Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-06-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2023) |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2023-05-02 | House | House passed Sub A |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2023) |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-04-21 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2023-04-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2023) |
2023-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2023) |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2023-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |