RI H6076 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Places the current Cranston police chief in a defined contribution retirement plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Retirement--retirement System Membership

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-19 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2017-10-03HouseTransmitted to Governor
2017-09-19SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2017-09-19SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-09-19HouseHouse read and passed
2017-09-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-09-19HouseCommittee recommends passage
2017-09-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (09/19/2017)
2017-09-15HouseMeeting postponed (09/15/2017)
2017-09-13HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2017-04-05HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback