RI H6071 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits on-duty/off-duty law enforcement officer from utilizing any robot/police robot dog/UAV, whether armed/unarmed, within the scope of their employment as well as police departments from purchase/procurement of any robots/UVAs/police robot dogs.
Title
Prohibition On The Use Of Police Robot Technology
Sponsors
Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Enrique Sanchez [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] |
Rep. Brianna Henries [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2023) |
2023-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H6071.pdf |