RI H6066 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the electric distribution company to report interconnection studies and not charge more than actual costs for the studies.
Title
Distributed Generation Interconnection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 9 N: 60 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 9 N: 60 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-23 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-08 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2021) |
2021-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2021) |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |