RI H6063 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows cities and towns and other governmental units to enter into agreements to provide shared services, activities and facilities.
Title
Interlocal Contracting, Joint Enterprises And Shared Services
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. David Coughlin [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/16/2015) |
2015-04-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H6063.pdf |
Roll Call | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=8164 |