RI H6020 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Azarig Kooloian, Jr., to join Kim Kooloian and David Anthony Ventris in marriage on or about June 24, 2017, within the City of Providence, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-04-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/27/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-04-06 | House | House read and passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/06/2017) |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2017) |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |