RI H6011 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Establishment Of Procedures To Regulate And License The Intentional Manipulation Of The Global Environment Through Geoengineering (creates A 5 Member Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations On The Regulation And Licensure Of Geoenginerring, And Who Would Report Back By April 2, 2018, And Expire On June 2, 2018.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Establishment Of Procedures To Regulate And License The Intentional Manipulation Of The Global Environment Through Geoengineering (creates A 5 Member Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations On The Regulation And Licensure Of Geoenginerring, And Who Would Report Back By April 2, 2018, And Expire On June 2, 2018.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-19 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-19HouseHouse passed Sub A
2017-09-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-06-30HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-06-30HouseScheduled for consideration (06/30/2017)
2017-04-07HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-03-31HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2017)
2017-03-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback