RI H6008 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that no later than 6/30/24, the dept. of education and the office of energy resources develop regulations for school buildings to meet the latest Northeast Collaborative for High Performance Schools standards of net zero energy capable schools.
Title
Foundation Level School Support
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2023) |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H6008.pdf |