RI H5996 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides interest on civil actions be calculated at a rate equal to weekly average one year constant maturity Treasury yield, as published by Board of Governors of Federal Reserve System, for the calendar week preceding the date of the judgment.
Title
Judgments, Orders, And Decrees
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5996.pdf |