RI H5995 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the criteria for distinguishing between felonies, misdemeanors and petty misdemeanors. It also changes the interpretation of the phrase "one year" wherever it appears in the general or public laws, to be three hundred sixty-four (364) days.
Title
Relating Criminal Procedure -- Sentence And Execution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5995.pdf |