RI H5993 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides police reform by requiring body cameras and makes certain methods of restraint a felony such as chokeholds and using the foot as a weapon.
Title
Rishod K. Gore Justice In Policing Act Of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] |
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5993.pdf |