RI H5990 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/06/2021)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/06/2021)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain social media companies from censoring users speech by either removal of the user's speech or using algorithms to prevent the user's speech.
Title
Procedure In Particular Actions -- Social Media Censorship Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/06/2021) |
2021-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5990.pdf |