RI H5976 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the permissive use of a wireless communication device for the purpose of navigation of a motor vehicle shall only be applicable in cases where the device is mounted or otherwise affixed to the vehicle and not held in the motorist's hand.
Title
Miscellaneous Rules
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5976.pdf |