RI H5976 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation - Facility And Imaging Surcharges (would Repeal Certain Tax Surcharges On Medical Imaging Services)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation - Facility And Imaging Surcharges (would Repeal Certain Tax Surcharges On Medical Imaging Services)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2013) |
2013-04-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5976.pdf |