RI H5972 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Broadens definition of "employee" to include assistants/technologists providing direct medical care to patients and allows union/association to file appeal to personnel appeal board.
Title
Health Care Facilities Staffing
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2017) |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5972.pdf |