RI H5939 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the minimum wage by using an annual fixed amount until 1/1/25, where it reaches to $15 per hour, then raised annually thereafter by using the CPI-W. Also raises hourly minimum wage for employees receiving gratuities by using similar scale.
Title
Wages
Sponsors
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Brianna Henries [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5939.pdf |