RI H5906 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Warwick Neck Avenue, Inc.
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Warwick Neck Avenue, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-03-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/30/2021) |
2021-03-16 | House | House read and passed |
2021-03-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/16/2021) |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/08/2021) |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |