RI H5906 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/10/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/10/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires licensed health care facility medical staff to adopt, implement, periodically and update evidence-based protocols for the early recognition and treatment of patients with sepsis, severe sepsis and septic shock.
Title
Licensing Of Health Care Facilities -- Sepsis Screening Protocols
Sponsors
Rep. John Lyle [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] |
Rep. George Nardone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/10/2019) |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5906.pdf |