RI H5906 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the exemption and would thus prohibit beverages sales near schools and places of worship for retailer Class B, C or I licenses located in the Wickenden Street area of Providence, and would prohibit the issuance of licenses in such area.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2015) |
2015-03-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5906.pdf |