RI H5905 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the town of Smithfield to require that serves of alcoholic beverages complete their certified training prior to employment within the town.
Title
Retail Licenses--renewal Of Class B, Class C, Class D, Class J. Class N And Class P Liquor Licenses Issued By The Town Of Smithfield
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | House read and passed |
2015-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015) |
2015-04-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2015) |
2015-03-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |