RI H5897 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prevents the energy facility siting board from proceeding to final hearing or issuing a final decision if one or more of the designated agencies inform the siting board that they are unable to form an advisory opinion due the conduct of the applicant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy Facility Siting Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-05-12HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2017)
2017-03-31HouseCommittee transferred to House Finance
2017-03-20HouseCommittee transferred to House Environment and Natural Resources
2017-03-20HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (03/21/2017)
2017-03-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2017-03-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback