RI H5893 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a municipal infrastructure grant program within the DOA relating to municipal and other public infrastructure projects.
Title
Rhode Island Municipal Infrastructure Grant Program
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Helder Cunha [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Justin Price [R] |
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2017) |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5893.pdf |