RI H5893 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education - School Committees And Superintendents - Student Dress Code Policy In The City Of Central Falls (would Mandate A School-wide Dress Code Policy In The City Of Central Falls)
Title
An Act Relating To Education - School Committees And Superintendents - Student Dress Code Policy In The City Of Central Falls (would Mandate A School-wide Dress Code Policy In The City Of Central Falls)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/26/2013) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/12/2013) |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2013-05-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-05-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/23/2013) |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2013) |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-03-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5893.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5893A.pdf |