RI H5887 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Right to Read Act to require certain licensed teachers to be proficient in scientific reading instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Certifications Standards Board [see Title 16 Chapter 97 - The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateSigned by Governor
2019-07-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28HouseHouse passed Sub B in concurrence
2019-06-28HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-28SenateSenate passed Sub B
2019-06-28SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-28SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub B
2019-06-28SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-28SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2019)
2019-06-25SenateReferred to Senate Education
2019-06-13HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-06-07HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/13/2019)
2019-06-05HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-03HouseProposed Substitute
2019-06-03HouseScheduled for consideration (06/05/2019)
2019-05-15HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019)
2019-04-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-29HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019)
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback