RI H5883 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each police officer during qualification and training sessions to fire a minimum of three hundred rounds effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5883.pdf |