RI H5883 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that public schools of this state, beginning in kindergarten and continuing through and including grade 12, would annually provide access for every student to at least one field trip to a nature preserve, reserve, or conservatory.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5883.pdf |