RI H5873 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes two or more municipalities to form regional emergency communication districts.
Title
Interlocal Contracting And Joint Enterprises, And Regional Emergency Communication Districts
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2017) |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5873.pdf |