RI H5869 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes sworn law enforcement officers and Rhode Island state troopers in the group of persons who may obtain the name, address and telephone numbers of persons to whom nonpublished service is furnished.
Title
Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5869.pdf |