RI H5863 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-19 - Meeting postponed (06/19/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-19 - Meeting postponed (06/19/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new process with standards to be utilized when deciding whether an applicant's past criminal contacts' convictions should disqualify them from receiving a government issued license.
Title
Licensing
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Meeting postponed (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | Meeting postponed (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-17 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019) |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/02/2019) |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/27/2019) |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-03-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5863.pdf |