RI H5859 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prevents the state or any governmental entity from infringing on the fundamental rights of parents in the upbringing of their children.
Title
School Committees And Superintendents
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Brian Rea [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2023) |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5859.pdf |