RI H5849 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Qualifies mobile and manufactured homes as affordable housing when installed in mobile home parks in groups of twenty (20) or more.
Title
Mobile And Manufactured Homes--affordable Housing
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Kenneth Mendonca [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2017) |
2017-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5849.pdf |