RI H5839 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance - Unfair Discrimination Against Subjects Of Abuse In Property And Casualty Insurance (would Prohibit Discrimination Against Victims Of Domestic Abuse In Property And Casualty Insurance)
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance - Unfair Discrimination Against Subjects Of Abuse In Property And Casualty Insurance (would Prohibit Discrimination Against Victims Of Domestic Abuse In Property And Casualty Insurance)
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Finn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2013) |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2013) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2013-04-24 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/24/2013) |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-03-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/03/2013) |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2013) |
2013-03-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5839.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5839A.pdf |