RI H5838 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes operators of developmental disability agencies, acting as a group, to self-insure healthcare costs for employees, retirees and other beneficiaries and to allow a third-party administrator to administer said program.
Title
Self-insurance Of Development Disability Agencies
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2015) |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5838.pdf |