RI H5821 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the definitions of "smoking" and "retail tobacco store" to include electronic smoking devices, electronic nicotine delivery system products and other products that rely on vaporization or aerosolization.
Title
Public Health And Workplace Safety Act
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Health and Human Services |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2017-06-07 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-06-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2017) |
2017-05-31 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2017) |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017) |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |