RI H5815 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulates the phase-out of wood stoves without EPA certification in densely populated residential areas and requires material burned in wood stoves to be clean wood or other approved material.
Title
Air Pollution
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2017) |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5815.pdf |