RI H5807 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a modification for charitable contributions to any federally recognized organization pursuant to IRC 501(c)(3).
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2023) |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5807.pdf |