RI H5780 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the fee for an original driver privilege card from fifty dollars ($50.00) to twenty-five dollars ($25.00).
Title
Driver Privilege Cards And Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-05-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2023) |
2023-04-06 | House | House read and passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/06/2023) |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/04/2023) |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2023) |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |