RI H5765 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Penalizes operating a motor vehicle with any significant amount of snow or ice with a fine of one hundred twenty-five dollars ($125).
Title
Adjudication Of Traffic Offenses--schedule Of Violations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5765.pdf |