RI H5764 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the test applicant to earn the required credits towards the qualification for the journeyperson "B" electrical examination by completing two hundred eighty-eight (288) hours of classroom training in a fully accredited trade school.
Title
Electricians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5764.pdf |