RI H5758 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the current law that allows farmers to sell produce directly to consumers by directing the department of health to permit home food manufacture and sales direct to consumers.
Title
Food And Drugs -- Sanitation In Food Establishments -- Home Food Manufacture Act
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] |
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Committee transferred to House Small Business |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5758.pdf |