RI H5758 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-19 - Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-19 - Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an "Operation Stand Down RI" registration plate to benefit struggling and/or homeless veterans.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Helder Cunha [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Senate - Registration of vehicles approval of amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2017-06-27 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |