RI H5758 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations Regarding Construction Of Schools Near Or Over Mine Sites And On How To Insure Safety Around Mines In Rhode Island (creates An Eight Member Special Legislative Study Commission To Study Mines In Rhode Island.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations Regarding Construction Of Schools Near Or Over Mine Sites And On How To Insure Safety Around Mines In Rhode Island (creates An Eight Member Special Legislative Study Commission To Study Mines In Rhode Island.)
Sponsors
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Karen Macbeth [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5758.pdf |