RI H5712 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions (would Make It Easier For Military Service Members And Their Spouses To Obtain Certifications And Licenses To Perform Regulated Professional Services.)
Title
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions (would Make It Easier For Military Service Members And Their Spouses To Obtain Certifications And Licenses To Perform Regulated Professional Services.)
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-26 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-06-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/26/2013) |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2013-06-05 | House | House read and passed |
2013-05-30 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2013) |
2013-05-30 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2013) |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5712.pdf |