RI H5709 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides additional guidance concerning the proposed disposition of remaining campaign funds of a deceased candidate or officeholder, former candidate or former officeholder.
Title
Campaign Finance
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-05-25 | House | House read and passed |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2017) |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/10/2017) |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |